U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00379
  • Case Name: Education Networks of America, Inc. v. State of Idaho et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2017
  • March 30, 2017: [Judgment]
  • March 30, 2017: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • March 28, 2017: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • March 03, 2017: [Stipulation]
February, 2017
  • February 17, 2017: [Order]
  • February 16, 2017: [Stipulation]
January, 2017
  • January 30, 2017: [Order]
  • January 30, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 30, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 12, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
December, 2016
  • December 12, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • December 01, 2016: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • December 01, 2016: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • December 01, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
November, 2016
  • November 29, 2016: [Stay]
  • November 28, 2016: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • November 23, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • November 14, 2016: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • November 14, 2016: [Counterclaim]
  • November 02, 2016: [Summons Issued]
October, 2016
  • October 31, 2016: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • October 31, 2016: [Dismiss]
  • October 26, 2016: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • October 20, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
  • October 19, 2016: [Request for Reassignment to a District Judge]
  • October 19, 2016: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • October 17, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
  • October 17, 2016: [Certificate of Service]
  • October 17, 2016: [Amended Complaint]
  • October 14, 2016: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • October 13, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 11, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
September, 2016
  • September 15, 2016: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • September 02, 2016: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • September 01, 2016: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • September 01, 2016: [Request for Waiver of Service]
August, 2016
  • August 25, 2016: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • August 24, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • August 19, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • August 19, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.