U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00378
  • Case Name: CenturyLink Communications, LLC v. State of Idaho et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2017
  • March 31, 2017: [Judgment]
  • March 31, 2017: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • March 31, 2017: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • March 06, 2017: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • March 02, 2017: [Order]
February, 2017
  • February 16, 2017: [Stipulation]
January, 2017
  • January 19, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 19, 2017: [Request for Reassignment Filed AND Reassignment of Case]
  • January 13, 2017: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • January 11, 2017: [Consent Filed]
  • January 11, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
  • January 11, 2017: [Order]
  • January 11, 2017: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • January 03, 2017: [Order]
  • January 03, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
December, 2016
  • December 22, 2016: [Stipulation]
November, 2016
  • November 17, 2016: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • November 17, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
  • November 17, 2016: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • November 16, 2016: [Amended Complaint]
September, 2016
  • September 19, 2016: [Status Report]
August, 2016
  • August 19, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.