U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:12-cv-00143
  • Case Name: ZB, N.A. v. Shilo Inn, Twin Falls, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2018
  • August 31, 2018: [Order]
  • August 31, 2018: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
April, 2018
  • April 03, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • April 03, 2018: [Docket Annotation]
  • April 03, 2018: [Corrective Entry - Proposed Orders]
  • April 03, 2018: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
November, 2017
  • November 09, 2017: [Declaration]
  • November 09, 2017: [Supplement]
October, 2017
  • October 31, 2017: [Errata]
  • October 30, 2017: [Declaration]
  • October 30, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • October 16, 2017: [Declaration]
  • October 16, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • October 10, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
September, 2017
  • September 25, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • September 25, 2017: [Declaration]
  • September 25, 2017: [Entry of Judgment]
August, 2017
  • August 25, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 03, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
June, 2017
  • June 29, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
May, 2017
  • May 30, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 17, 2017: [Order]
  • May 16, 2017: [Stipulation]
April, 2017
  • April 28, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
March, 2017
  • March 30, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 06, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
February, 2017
  • February 06, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
December, 2016
  • December 30, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 05, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
November, 2016
  • November 04, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
October, 2016
  • October 31, 2016: [Declaration]
  • October 03, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
August, 2016
  • August 30, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 26, 2016: [Writ Issued]
  • August 22, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.