U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:12-cv-00141
  • Case Name: ZB, N.A. v. Shilo Inn et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2018
  • August 31, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • August 31, 2018: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
October, 2017
  • October 19, 2017: [Corrective Entry]
  • October 10, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
April, 2017
  • April 12, 2017: [Order]
  • April 12, 2017: [~Util - Add and Terminate Parties]
  • April 10, 2017: [Stipulation]
January, 2017
  • January 17, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
December, 2016
  • December 05, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
November, 2016
  • November 08, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
October, 2016
  • October 03, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
September, 2016
  • September 27, 2016: [Order]
  • September 26, 2016: [Stipulation]
August, 2016
  • August 30, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 22, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.