U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00380
  • Case Name: United States of America v. All of the sellers rights, title and interests in the land and appurtenances located at 605 North 5th Avenue, Caldwell, Canyon County, Idaho, being parcel number 019660000 et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2017
  • October 23, 2017: [Order on Motion for Entry of Judgment]
September, 2017
  • September 29, 2017: [Entry of Judgment]
  • September 11, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 11, 2017: [Judgment - Default]
  • September 07, 2017: [Default Judgment]
August, 2017
  • August 16, 2017: [Clerks Entry of Default]
  • August 10, 2017: [Entry of Default]
July, 2017
  • July 28, 2017: [Entry of Default]
January, 2017
  • January 25, 2017: [Service by Publication]
  • January 11, 2017: [Notice of Substitution]
October, 2016
  • October 31, 2016: [Certificate of Service]
  • October 28, 2016: [Certificate of Service]
August, 2016
  • August 26, 2016: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • August 25, 2016: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • August 25, 2016: [~Util - Sealed Order]
  • August 22, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.