U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00377
  • Case Name: Shirley v. The State of Idaho et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2017
  • December 22, 2017: [USCA Order]
September, 2017
  • September 15, 2017: [USCA Case Number]
  • September 14, 2017: [Notice of Appeal]
  • September 14, 2017: [Order]
February, 2017
  • February 03, 2017: [Judgment]
  • February 03, 2017: [Order on Motion for Certificate of Appealability]
  • February 03, 2017: [Order on Motion for Writ of Mandamus]
January, 2017
  • January 17, 2017: [Certificate of Appealability]
  • January 10, 2017: [Letter]
December, 2016
  • December 21, 2016: [Response (generic)]
  • December 08, 2016: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 08, 2016: [Order]
  • December 08, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
November, 2016
  • November 29, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 14, 2016: [Letter]
  • November 07, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2016
  • October 18, 2016: [Appoint Counsel]
September, 2016
  • September 23, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 20, 2016: [Issuance]
  • September 07, 2016: [Consent Filed]
  • September 07, 2016: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
  • September 07, 2016: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
August, 2016
  • August 23, 2016: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • August 23, 2016: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • August 23, 2016: [Writ of Mandamus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.