U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00384
  • Case Name: Jain Irrigation, Inc. v. Droplet Irrigation, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2018
  • October 18, 2018: [Docket Annotation]
  • October 18, 2018: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
September, 2018
  • September 10, 2018: [Status Report]
August, 2018
  • August 20, 2018: [Order]
  • August 16, 2018: [Status Report]
February, 2018
  • February 22, 2018: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • February 07, 2018: [Corrective Entry]
  • February 07, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
January, 2018
  • January 04, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
September, 2016
  • September 21, 2016: [Notice of Bankruptcy Filing]
August, 2016
  • August 29, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • August 23, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • August 23, 2016: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • August 23, 2016: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • August 23, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • August 23, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.