U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00381
  • Case Name: McCabe v. Blades
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2018
  • June 25, 2018: [USCA Order]
March, 2018
  • March 30, 2018: [USCA Case Number]
  • March 28, 2018: [Notice of Appeal]
  • March 14, 2018: [Judgment]
  • March 14, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • March 14, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
June, 2017
  • June 26, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • June 13, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • June 06, 2017: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • June 06, 2017: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • June 06, 2017: [Terminate Deadlines/Hearings]
May, 2017
  • May 26, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • May 25, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 25, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 04, 2017: [Reminder Notice- 30 day]
  • May 04, 2017: [Notice of Summary Judgment]
April, 2017
  • April 27, 2017: [Dismiss]
  • April 27, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
March, 2017
  • March 20, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 09, 2017: [Consent Filed]
February, 2017
  • February 21, 2017: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • February 16, 2017: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • February 07, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
  • February 03, 2017: [Order]
  • February 03, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
November, 2016
  • November 03, 2016: [Notice of Change of Address]
August, 2016
  • August 23, 2016: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • August 23, 2016: [Receipt]
  • August 23, 2016: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • August 23, 2016: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.