U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:16-cv-00383
  • Case Name: Johnson v. Cach, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2019
  • April 19, 2019: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
October, 2018
  • October 22, 2018: [Notice of Removal of Attorney From Electronic Notice]
February, 2018
  • February 09, 2018: [Order on Motion to Reopen Case]
  • February 09, 2018: [Order on Motion to Strike]
December, 2017
  • December 20, 2017: [Certificate of Service]
  • December 20, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • December 01, 2017: [Certificate of Service]
November, 2017
  • November 30, 2017: [Strike]
  • November 30, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • November 20, 2017: [Response to Motion]
October, 2017
  • October 28, 2017: [Reopen Case]
September, 2017
  • September 25, 2017: [Order on Motion to Substitute Party]
  • September 25, 2017: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • September 25, 2017: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • September 25, 2017: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • September 21, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • September 05, 2017: [Strike]
  • September 05, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
August, 2017
  • August 31, 2017: [Response to Motion]
June, 2017
  • June 20, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
May, 2017
  • May 01, 2017: [Notice of Change of Address]
March, 2017
  • March 21, 2017: [Certificate of Service]
  • March 21, 2017: [Notice of Bankruptcy Filing]
February, 2017
  • February 28, 2017: [Strike]
  • February 28, 2017: [Amended Document (NOT Motion)]
  • February 22, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • February 09, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • February 03, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • February 02, 2017: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • February 02, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
January, 2017
  • January 23, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • January 13, 2017: [Reconsideration]
  • January 12, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • January 06, 2017: [Substitute Party]
December, 2016
  • December 19, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
  • December 16, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
November, 2016
  • November 15, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
October, 2016
  • October 28, 2016: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • October 24, 2016: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • October 13, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • October 12, 2016: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 11, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • October 05, 2016: [Order on Motion to Supplement]
  • October 05, 2016: [Discovery Plan]
  • October 05, 2016: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
September, 2016
  • September 28, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • September 28, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • September 27, 2016: [Supplement]
  • September 23, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • September 14, 2016: [Order on Motion for Entry of Default]
  • September 14, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • September 08, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
August, 2016
  • August 31, 2016: [Certificate of Service]
  • August 31, 2016: [Corrective Entry - Certificate of Service]
  • August 31, 2016: [Dismiss]
  • August 30, 2016: [Entry of Default]
  • August 30, 2016: [Corrective Entry]
  • August 29, 2016: [Affidavit of Service]
  • August 29, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • August 25, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • August 24, 2016: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • August 24, 2016: [Supplement]
  • August 24, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 23, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • August 23, 2016: [Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • August 23, 2016: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • August 23, 2016: [Docket Annotation]
  • August 23, 2016: [Return of Service/Process Assumed]
  • August 23, 2016: [Corrective Entry - Notice of Removal]
  • August 22, 2016: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.