U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00321
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Jones
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2017
  • March 06, 2017: [Order Dismissing Case]
December, 2016
  • December 12, 2016: [Status Report]
  • December 08, 2016: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • December 05, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 02, 2016: [Contempt Hearing]
  • December 01, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
November, 2016
  • November 30, 2016: [Certificate of Service]
  • November 28, 2016: [Response (generic)]
  • November 28, 2016: [Order]
  • November 22, 2016: [Response (generic)]
  • November 22, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 14, 2016: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 14, 2016: [Order]
  • November 14, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 14, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 10, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 08, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 01, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
October, 2016
  • October 26, 2016: [Order]
  • October 26, 2016: [Show Cause Hearing]
  • October 25, 2016: [Letter]
  • October 25, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 25, 2016: [Certificate of Service]
  • October 20, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 18, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • October 17, 2016: [Docket Annotation]
  • October 11, 2016: [Answer to Petition to Enforce IRS Summons]
  • October 11, 2016: [Response to Order to Show Cause]
  • October 11, 2016: [Dismiss]
  • October 04, 2016: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • October 04, 2016: [Response to Order to Show Cause]
September, 2016
  • September 26, 2016: [Affidavit of Service]
August, 2016
  • August 25, 2016: [Order to Show Cause]
  • August 23, 2016: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.