U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:14-cv-00149
  • Case Name: Griffith v. Blades
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2021
  • February 26, 2021: [Hearing]
  • February 26, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • February 17, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2018
  • October 03, 2018: [Letter]
September, 2018
  • September 27, 2018: [USCA Order]
August, 2018
  • August 09, 2018: [USCA Case Number]
  • August 08, 2018: [Notice of Appeal]
June, 2018
  • June 22, 2018: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • June 13, 2018: [Letter]
March, 2018
  • March 02, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
January, 2018
  • January 31, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • January 19, 2018: [Reconsideration]
December, 2017
  • December 18, 2017: [USCA Order]
November, 2017
  • November 08, 2017: [USCA Order]
September, 2017
  • September 06, 2017: [USCA Case Number]
August, 2017
  • August 30, 2017: [Notice of Appeal]
  • August 16, 2017: [Judgment]
  • August 16, 2017: [Order Dismissing Case]
February, 2017
  • February 07, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
January, 2017
  • January 30, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • January 10, 2017: [Hearing]
  • January 10, 2017: [Appoint Counsel]
December, 2016
  • December 19, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • December 13, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • December 09, 2016: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
November, 2016
  • November 21, 2016: [Certificate of Service]
  • November 21, 2016: [Corrective Entry - Certificate of Service]
  • November 21, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • November 21, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • November 21, 2016: [File Excess Pages]
  • November 15, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 15, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • November 14, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 14, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • November 08, 2016: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • November 01, 2016: [Notice of Summary Judgment]
October, 2016
  • October 31, 2016: [Supplement]
  • October 31, 2016: [Dismiss]
  • October 31, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 18, 2016: [Supplement]
  • October 04, 2016: [Order]
  • October 04, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 04, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
September, 2016
  • September 20, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • September 09, 2016: [Extension of Time to File]
  • September 08, 2016: [Extension of Time to File]
August, 2016
  • August 24, 2016: [Consents (All are in)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.