U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:16-cv-00372
  • Case Name: Axtman v. Commissioner of Social Security
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2017
  • April 20, 2017: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 20, 2017: [Judgment]
  • April 20, 2017: [Order on Motion to Remand to Agency]
  • April 18, 2017: [Remand to Agency]
March, 2017
  • March 30, 2017: [Order]
  • March 30, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 30, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 28, 2017: [Declaration]
  • March 28, 2017: [Extension of Time to File]
February, 2017
  • February 27, 2017: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
  • February 15, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
  • February 09, 2017: [Notice of Substitution]
  • February 02, 2017: [Order]
  • February 02, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 02, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 01, 2017: [Extension of Time to File]
January, 2017
  • January 04, 2017: [Administrative Record]
  • January 04, 2017: [Answer to Petition for Review]
November, 2016
  • November 21, 2016: [Consents (All are in)]
  • November 02, 2016: [Consent Filed]
  • November 01, 2016: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • November 01, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
September, 2016
  • September 16, 2016: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 02, 2016: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • September 02, 2016: [Corrective Entry]
August, 2016
  • August 25, 2016: [Procedural Order (SS)]
  • August 25, 2016: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • August 24, 2016: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • August 24, 2016: [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • August 24, 2016: [Petition for Review]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.