U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00385
  • Case Name: Calva Products LLC v. Carlos Flores Reyes
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2019
  • April 17, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
March, 2017
  • March 23, 2017: [Order on Motion for Default Judgment]
October, 2016
  • October 27, 2016: [Default Judgment]
  • October 27, 2016: [Clerks Entry of Default]
September, 2016
  • September 29, 2016: [Certificate of Service]
  • September 28, 2016: [Entry of Default]
August, 2016
  • August 30, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • August 25, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • August 24, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • August 24, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.