U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00386
  • Case Name: Hayes v. Page
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2018
  • September 24, 2018: [Judgment]
  • September 24, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
May, 2018
  • May 23, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
February, 2018
  • February 08, 2018: [Reply (generic)]
January, 2018
  • January 31, 2018: [Letter]
  • January 25, 2018: [Reply (generic)]
December, 2017
  • December 11, 2017: [Response to Habeas Petition]
November, 2017
  • November 27, 2017: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
August, 2017
  • August 28, 2017: [Memorandum Decision]
  • August 28, 2017: [Order]
  • August 28, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 28, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
April, 2017
  • April 10, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • April 03, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
March, 2017
  • March 20, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 20, 2017: [Produce]
  • March 20, 2017: [Strike]
  • March 20, 2017: [Appoint Counsel]
  • March 20, 2017: [Response to Motion]
February, 2017
  • February 27, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 27, 2017: [Notice of Summary Judgment]
  • February 27, 2017: [Dismiss]
December, 2016
  • December 07, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
November, 2016
  • November 29, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw]
  • November 29, 2016: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • November 17, 2016: [Withdraw]
  • November 17, 2016: [Receipt]
September, 2016
  • September 01, 2016: [Request for Reassignment Filed AND Reassignment of Case]
August, 2016
  • August 25, 2016: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • August 25, 2016: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
  • August 25, 2016: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • August 25, 2016: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
  • August 25, 2016: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.