U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00388
  • Case Name: Elliott et al v. Smith et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2017
  • January 24, 2017: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • January 17, 2017: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
November, 2016
  • November 18, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • November 07, 2016: [Seal Document]
  • November 07, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • November 04, 2016: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
October, 2016
  • October 27, 2016: [Corrective Entry - Discovery]
  • October 24, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 20, 2016: [Protective Order]
  • October 19, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • October 17, 2016: [Order]
  • October 17, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • October 14, 2016: [Compel]
September, 2016
  • September 27, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 20, 2016: [Supplement]
  • September 20, 2016: [Subpoena Returned Executed]
  • September 19, 2016: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • September 13, 2016: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
  • September 12, 2016: [Affidavit of Service]
  • September 02, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
August, 2016
  • August 30, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 30, 2016: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • August 30, 2016: [Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • August 30, 2016: [Return of Service/Process Assumed]
  • August 29, 2016: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.