U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:16-cv-00389
  • Case Name: Ray v. Colvin
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2018
  • March 30, 2018: [Judgment]
  • March 30, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
June, 2017
  • June 05, 2017: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
May, 2017
  • May 17, 2017: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
April, 2017
  • April 27, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 26, 2017: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
February, 2017
  • February 27, 2017: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
January, 2017
  • January 26, 2017: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
  • January 06, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • January 06, 2017: [Extension of Time to File]
December, 2016
  • December 05, 2016: [Administrative Record]
  • December 05, 2016: [Answer to Petition for Review]
October, 2016
  • October 12, 2016: [Consents (All are in)]
  • October 06, 2016: [Consent Filed]
  • October 04, 2016: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • October 03, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
  • October 03, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
August, 2016
  • August 31, 2016: [Procedural Order (SS)]
  • August 31, 2016: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • August 30, 2016: [Supplement]
  • August 30, 2016: [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • August 30, 2016: [Petition for Review]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.