U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00392
  • Case Name: Hawkins v. Winmill et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2017
  • October 27, 2017: [USCA Mandate]
  • October 20, 2017: [USCA Order]
June, 2017
  • June 14, 2017: [USCA Order]
March, 2017
  • March 16, 2017: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • March 16, 2017: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
December, 2016
  • December 30, 2016: [USCA Scheduling Order]
  • December 30, 2016: [USCA Case Number]
  • December 21, 2016: [Notice of Appeal]
  • December 06, 2016: [Order Dismissing Case]
November, 2016
  • November 22, 2016: [Take Judicial Notice]
  • November 02, 2016: [Take Judicial Notice]
October, 2016
  • October 31, 2016: [Order]
  • October 31, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 24, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 24, 2016: [Hearing]
  • October 24, 2016: [Appoint Counsel]
  • October 24, 2016: [Take Judicial Notice]
  • October 07, 2016: [Order of Recusal]
  • October 06, 2016: [Take Judicial Notice]
  • October 06, 2016: [Hearing]
September, 2016
  • September 14, 2016: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • September 02, 2016: [Order]
  • September 01, 2016: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • September 01, 2016: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • September 01, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.