U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00398
  • Case Name: Belecz v. Colvin
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2019
  • May 10, 2019: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
  • May 06, 2019: [Response to Motion]
April, 2019
  • April 16, 2019: [Attorney Fees]
March, 2019
  • March 05, 2019: [Certificate of Service]
  • March 05, 2019: [Judgment]
  • March 05, 2019: [Memorandum Decision]
May, 2018
  • May 31, 2018: [Reply (generic)]
  • May 14, 2018: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
April, 2018
  • April 13, 2018: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
March, 2018
  • March 15, 2018: [Administrative Record]
  • March 15, 2018: [Answer to Petition for Review]
February, 2018
  • February 13, 2018: [Consents (All are in)]
  • February 13, 2018: [Consent Filed]
  • February 09, 2018: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • February 05, 2018: [Notice of Appearance]
December, 2017
  • December 20, 2017: [Summons Issued as to USA]
September, 2016
  • September 07, 2016: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • September 07, 2016: [Procedural Order (SS)]
  • September 02, 2016: [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • September 02, 2016: [Petition for Review]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.