U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cv-00391
  • Case Name: Acheson v. Fleming et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2018
  • January 25, 2018: [Judgment]
  • January 25, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
November, 2017
  • November 16, 2017: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • November 16, 2017: [Order]
September, 2017
  • September 19, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • September 14, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
August, 2017
  • August 24, 2017: [Dismiss]
July, 2017
  • July 10, 2017: [Receipt]
  • July 03, 2017: [Order]
  • July 03, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
May, 2017
  • May 26, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
  • May 08, 2017: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • May 08, 2017: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
April, 2017
  • April 27, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 26, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
March, 2017
  • March 27, 2017: [Corrective Entry]
  • March 27, 2017: [Certificate of Clerk]
  • March 24, 2017: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
December, 2016
  • December 01, 2016: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • December 01, 2016: [Notice of Change of Address]
September, 2016
  • September 02, 2016: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • September 02, 2016: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • September 02, 2016: [Consent Filed]
  • September 02, 2016: [Complaint]
  • September 02, 2016: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
  • September 02, 2016: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.