U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00390
  • Case Name: Winn v. Blades
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2018
  • July 17, 2018: [USCA Order]
May, 2018
  • May 23, 2018: [Notice of Appeal]
  • May 09, 2018: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
February, 2018
  • February 12, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • February 08, 2018: [USCA Order]
January, 2018
  • January 25, 2018: [USCA Order]
  • January 25, 2018: [USCA Case Number]
  • January 24, 2018: [Notice of Appeal]
  • January 24, 2018: [Reconsideration]
  • January 04, 2018: [Judgment]
  • January 04, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • January 04, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • January 04, 2018: [Order on Motion to Strike]
October, 2017
  • October 31, 2017: [Amended Document (NOT Motion)]
  • October 31, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
September, 2017
  • September 26, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • September 11, 2017: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
  • September 11, 2017: [Strike]
  • September 06, 2017: [Supplement]
  • September 06, 2017: [Affidavit]
July, 2017
  • July 18, 2017: [Supplement]
May, 2017
  • May 22, 2017: [Response (generic)]
  • May 22, 2017: [Corrective Entry]
  • May 04, 2017: [Reply (generic)]
April, 2017
  • April 24, 2017: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 18, 2017: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • April 12, 2017: [Response to Motion]
March, 2017
  • March 17, 2017: [Reminder Notice- 30 day]
  • March 17, 2017: [Notice of Summary Judgment]
  • March 15, 2017: [Dismiss]
  • March 15, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
December, 2016
  • December 15, 2016: [Consent Filed]
  • December 07, 2016: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
November, 2016
  • November 30, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
  • November 15, 2016: [Order]
  • November 15, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
September, 2016
  • September 02, 2016: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • September 02, 2016: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • September 02, 2016: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
  • September 02, 2016: [Receipt]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.