U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:16-cv-00400
  • Case Name: Higgins v. Farm Credit Services of America, PCA et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2018
  • November 20, 2018: [USCA Order]
June, 2018
  • June 29, 2018: [Transcript Request]
  • June 12, 2018: [USCA Scheduling Order]
  • June 12, 2018: [USCA Case Number]
  • June 06, 2018: [Notice of Cross Appeal]
  • June 05, 2018: [USCA Scheduling Order]
  • June 05, 2018: [USCA Case Number]
  • June 01, 2018: [Notice of Change of Address]
May, 2018
  • May 30, 2018: [Notice of Appeal]
  • May 02, 2018: [Judgment]
  • May 02, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
April, 2018
  • April 04, 2018: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 04, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
March, 2018
  • March 30, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • March 28, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • March 12, 2018: [Strike]
  • March 12, 2018: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
February, 2018
  • February 28, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • February 15, 2018: [Sealed Document]
  • February 14, 2018: [Sealed Document]
  • February 14, 2018: [Response to Motion]
January, 2018
  • January 24, 2018: [Summary Judgment]
September, 2017
  • September 25, 2017: [Order]
  • September 25, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • September 22, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • September 12, 2017: [Order]
August, 2017
  • August 02, 2017: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • August 02, 2017: [Notice of Case Number Change]
May, 2017
  • May 24, 2017: [Protective Order]
  • May 23, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • May 05, 2017: [ADR Plan]
February, 2017
  • February 17, 2017: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • February 07, 2017: [Order]
  • February 07, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 03, 2017: [Discovery Plan]
  • February 02, 2017: [Scheduling Conf Form/Litigation Plan]
January, 2017
  • January 20, 2017: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • January 20, 2017: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
December, 2016
  • December 15, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 15, 2016: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • December 13, 2016: [Order]
  • December 12, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • December 12, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
  • December 07, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
September, 2016
  • September 30, 2016: [Status Report]
  • September 07, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • September 04, 2016: [Amended Complaint]
  • September 02, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.