U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:16-cv-00397
  • Case Name: Leigh v. commissioner of Social Security
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2017
  • April 04, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
February, 2017
  • February 27, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • February 01, 2017: [Dismiss]
January, 2017
  • January 03, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
December, 2016
  • December 28, 2016: [Extension of Time to File]
November, 2016
  • November 29, 2016: [Administrative Record]
  • November 29, 2016: [Answer to Petition for Review]
  • November 21, 2016: [Consents (All are in)]
October, 2016
  • October 26, 2016: [Consent Filed]
  • October 25, 2016: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • October 25, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
September, 2016
  • September 22, 2016: [Procedural Order (SS)]
  • September 07, 2016: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • September 06, 2016: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 06, 2016: [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • September 06, 2016: [Petition for Review]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.