U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00396
  • Case Name: Andoe v. Otter et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2018
  • January 11, 2018: [Letter]
October, 2017
  • October 05, 2017: [Letter]
June, 2017
  • June 01, 2017: [USCA Mandate]
May, 2017
  • May 24, 2017: [USCA Order]
  • May 08, 2017: [Letter]
March, 2017
  • March 16, 2017: [USCA Order]
December, 2016
  • December 15, 2016: [USCA Order]
  • December 02, 2016: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • December 02, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 02, 2016: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • December 02, 2016: [Letter]
November, 2016
  • November 08, 2016: [Strike]
  • November 08, 2016: [Letter]
  • November 08, 2016: [Request]
  • November 02, 2016: [Letter]
October, 2016
  • October 27, 2016: [USCA Order]
  • October 25, 2016: [USCA Scheduling Order]
  • October 25, 2016: [USCA Case Number]
  • October 19, 2016: [Notice of Appeal]
  • October 19, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 19, 2016: [Supplement]
  • October 19, 2016: [Reconsideration]
  • October 05, 2016: [Order Directing Prisoner Payment]
  • October 05, 2016: [Judgment]
  • October 05, 2016: [Order Dismissing Case]
September, 2016
  • September 26, 2016: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
  • September 26, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 26, 2016: [Letter]
  • September 14, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 07, 2016: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • September 07, 2016: [Consent Filed]
  • September 07, 2016: [Letter]
  • September 07, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 07, 2016: [Complaint]
  • September 07, 2016: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 07, 2016: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.