U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00395
  • Case Name: Andoe v. Obama et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2020
  • April 29, 2020: [Letter]
  • April 14, 2020: [USCA Mandate]
  • April 07, 2020: [USCA Order]
March, 2020
  • March 31, 2020: [Letter]
December, 2019
  • December 17, 2019: [USCA Memorandum]
May, 2019
  • May 17, 2019: [USCA Order]
April, 2019
  • April 26, 2019: [USCA Order]
February, 2019
  • February 04, 2019: [USCA Scheduling Order]
  • February 04, 2019: [USCA Case Number]
January, 2019
  • January 30, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • January 30, 2019: [Order on Motion for Entry of Judgment]
  • January 28, 2019: [Notice of Appeal]
  • January 28, 2019: [Errata]
  • January 17, 2019: [Entry of Judgment]
  • January 17, 2019: [Letter]
  • January 17, 2019: [Supplement]
  • January 03, 2019: [Amend/Correct]
November, 2018
  • November 30, 2018: [Judgment]
  • November 30, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • November 27, 2018: [Request]
  • November 26, 2018: [Default Judgment]
October, 2018
  • October 18, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
June, 2018
  • June 22, 2018: [Letter]
May, 2018
  • May 22, 2018: [Amended Complaint]
  • May 10, 2018: [Request]
  • May 09, 2018: [Order]
  • May 09, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 09, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
March, 2018
  • March 22, 2018: [Letter]
January, 2018
  • January 26, 2018: [Default Judgment]
  • January 26, 2018: [Statement]
  • January 25, 2018: [USCA Order]
  • January 19, 2018: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • January 19, 2018: [Order Reassigning Case]
December, 2017
  • December 14, 2017: [Summary Judgment]
October, 2017
  • October 27, 2017: [USCA Mandate]
  • October 20, 2017: [Supplement]
September, 2017
  • September 05, 2017: [Letter]
August, 2017
  • August 25, 2017: [Letter]
  • August 14, 2017: [USCA Mandate]
July, 2017
  • July 18, 2017: [USCA Memorandum]
June, 2017
  • June 14, 2017: [Corrective Entry]
  • June 14, 2017: [USCA Order]
May, 2017
  • May 24, 2017: [USCA Order]
February, 2017
  • February 28, 2017: [USCA Scheduling Order]
  • February 28, 2017: [USCA Case Number]
  • February 24, 2017: [Notice of Appeal]
  • February 03, 2017: [Judgment]
  • February 03, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 03, 2017: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • February 03, 2017: [Order on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings]
January, 2017
  • January 31, 2017: [Judgment on the Pleadings]
  • January 17, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
December, 2016
  • December 16, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
  • December 02, 2016: [Statement]
November, 2016
  • November 22, 2016: [Request]
  • November 15, 2016: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • November 08, 2016: [Request]
  • November 02, 2016: [Letter]
  • November 02, 2016: [Judgment as a Matter of Law]
  • November 02, 2016: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
  • November 02, 2016: [Supplement]
October, 2016
  • October 26, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 19, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 19, 2016: [Supplement]
  • October 19, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 19, 2016: [Disqualify Judge]
September, 2016
  • September 26, 2016: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
  • September 26, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 26, 2016: [Letter]
  • September 20, 2016: [Consent Filed]
  • September 20, 2016: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
  • September 20, 2016: [Letter]
  • September 14, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 07, 2016: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • September 07, 2016: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • September 07, 2016: [Letter]
  • September 07, 2016: [Complaint]
  • September 07, 2016: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
  • September 07, 2016: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.