U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:16-cv-00393
  • Case Name: Ward v. Education Credit Management Corporation et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2017
  • September 05, 2017: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • September 01, 2017: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
August, 2017
  • August 02, 2017: [Order Reassigning Case]
April, 2017
  • April 28, 2017: [Order]
  • April 28, 2017: [~Util - Add and Terminate Parties]
  • April 27, 2017: [Amended Document (NOT Motion)]
  • April 27, 2017: [Stipulation]
March, 2017
  • March 29, 2017: [Order]
  • March 28, 2017: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
December, 2016
  • December 30, 2016: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
  • December 01, 2016: [Order]
  • December 01, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
November, 2016
  • November 30, 2016: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • November 29, 2016: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • November 28, 2016: [Discovery Plan]
  • November 28, 2016: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • November 14, 2016: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
October, 2016
  • October 28, 2016: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • October 28, 2016: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • October 21, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
September, 2016
  • September 23, 2016: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • September 23, 2016: [Order]
  • September 16, 2016: [Consent Filed]
  • September 12, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • September 08, 2016: [Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • September 08, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
  • September 08, 2016: [Supplement]
  • September 08, 2016: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • September 08, 2016: [Corrective Entry - Notice of Removal]
  • September 08, 2016: [Return of Service/Process Assumed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.