U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00404
  • Case Name: Ortega v. Collection Bureau, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2016
  • November 22, 2016: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • November 22, 2016: [Consents (All are in)]
  • November 21, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 18, 2016: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • November 09, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
October, 2016
  • October 27, 2016: [Consent Filed]
  • October 26, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • October 26, 2016: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • October 26, 2016: [Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • October 25, 2016: [Affidavit]
  • October 25, 2016: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
September, 2016
  • September 13, 2016: [Order]
  • September 13, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 09, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • September 08, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.