U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00405
  • Case Name: Intermountain Fair Housing Council, Inc. v. Russell Square Apartments et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2018
  • January 19, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
December, 2017
  • December 20, 2017: [Settlement Conference]
  • December 07, 2017: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • December 07, 2017: [Status Conference]
November, 2017
  • November 27, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • November 27, 2017: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 02, 2017: [Stipulation]
October, 2017
  • October 31, 2017: [Order]
  • October 31, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 30, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • October 23, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 13, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 13, 2017: [Order]
  • October 13, 2017: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
September, 2017
  • September 19, 2017: [Order]
  • September 12, 2017: [Stipulation]
June, 2017
  • June 01, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
May, 2017
  • May 10, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • May 04, 2017: [Order]
  • May 04, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
April, 2017
  • April 13, 2017: [Order]
  • April 13, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 10, 2017: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
March, 2017
  • March 20, 2017: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • March 16, 2017: [Order]
  • March 13, 2017: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • March 11, 2017: [Waiver of Service Executed]
February, 2017
  • February 21, 2017: [Summons Issued]
  • February 20, 2017: [Amended Document (NOT Motion)]
  • February 16, 2017: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • February 08, 2017: [Order]
  • February 08, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 07, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 06, 2017: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • February 03, 2017: [Stipulation]
January, 2017
  • January 23, 2017: [Amended Complaint]
  • January 23, 2017: [Amend/Correct]
  • January 18, 2017: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • January 16, 2017: [Dismiss]
  • January 16, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
  • January 13, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
  • January 12, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
December, 2016
  • December 28, 2016: [Consent Filed]
  • December 13, 2016: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • December 09, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • December 09, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
November, 2016
  • November 21, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • November 04, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • November 03, 2016: [Stipulation]
October, 2016
  • October 31, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
September, 2016
  • September 16, 2016: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • September 16, 2016: [Order]
  • September 12, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • September 09, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • September 09, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.