U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:16-cv-00410
  • Case Name: The Travelers Indemnity Company et al v. Westco, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2017
  • May 30, 2017: [Judgment]
  • May 30, 2017: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • May 26, 2017: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
April, 2017
  • April 26, 2017: [Order]
  • April 26, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 26, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
March, 2017
  • March 14, 2017: [Stay]
January, 2017
  • January 09, 2017: [Stipulation]
December, 2016
  • December 23, 2016: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • December 12, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 07, 2016: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 06, 2016: [Order]
  • December 05, 2016: [Stipulation]
November, 2016
  • November 17, 2016: [Consent Filed]
  • November 02, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
October, 2016
  • October 28, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
  • October 19, 2016: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • October 14, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
  • October 03, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
September, 2016
  • September 30, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • September 27, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • September 15, 2016: [Supplement]
  • September 13, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • September 13, 2016: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • September 13, 2016: [Corrective Entry]
  • September 12, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.