U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:16-cv-00411
  • Case Name: Malloy v. Primary Care Specialists et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2016
  • November 23, 2016: [Judgment]
  • November 23, 2016: [Order Dismissing Case]
October, 2016
  • October 03, 2016: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • October 03, 2016: [Order]
September, 2016
  • September 30, 2016: [Report and Recommendations]
  • September 19, 2016: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • September 19, 2016: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • September 13, 2016: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 13, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.