U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:16-cv-00394
  • Case Name: Miller v. Munn et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2017
  • May 04, 2017: [Return Mail]
April, 2017
  • April 18, 2017: [Judgment]
  • April 18, 2017: [Order]
January, 2017
  • January 10, 2017: [Return Mail]
  • January 03, 2017: [Certificate of Service]
December, 2016
  • December 22, 2016: [Return Mail]
  • December 09, 2016: [Order]
  • December 09, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 09, 2016: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • December 09, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
September, 2016
  • September 22, 2016: [Consent Filed]
  • September 13, 2016: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • September 13, 2016: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • September 13, 2016: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
  • September 13, 2016: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
  • September 13, 2016: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.