U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00408
  • Case Name: Mustafa v. Department of Homeland Security
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2016
  • December 29, 2016: [Order on Motion to Remand to Agency]
  • December 22, 2016: [Consents (All are in)]
  • December 19, 2016: [Remand to Agency]
  • December 09, 2016: [Consent Filed]
  • December 07, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • December 07, 2016: [Corrective Entry]
  • December 07, 2016: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • December 07, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 06, 2016: [Certificate of Service]
  • December 06, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 05, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
November, 2016
  • November 30, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
  • November 30, 2016: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • November 23, 2016: [Order]
  • November 23, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 22, 2016: [Amended Complaint]
  • November 03, 2016: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Pro Bono]
  • November 02, 2016: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance Pro Bono/Fee Waiver]
  • November 02, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
  • November 01, 2016: [Order]
October, 2016
  • October 04, 2016: [Letter]
September, 2016
  • September 29, 2016: [Supplement]
  • September 29, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • September 13, 2016: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • September 13, 2016: [Complaint]
  • September 13, 2016: [Receipt]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.