U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cv-00413
  • Case Name: Ruchert et al v. Nez Perce Tribe et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2017
  • July 21, 2017: [Judgment]
  • July 21, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
November, 2016
  • November 30, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 30, 2016: [Continue]
  • November 22, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • November 18, 2016: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • November 16, 2016: [Consent Filed]
  • November 11, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • November 07, 2016: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
October, 2016
  • October 21, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
September, 2016
  • September 16, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
  • September 15, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • September 15, 2016: [Supplement]
  • September 15, 2016: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • September 15, 2016: [Corrective Entry - Notice of Removal]
  • September 15, 2016: [Return of Service/Process Assumed]
  • September 14, 2016: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.