U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00414
  • Case Name: Visual Arts Collective, LLC et al v. Powell et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2018
  • March 12, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
December, 2016
  • December 23, 2016: [Stipulation]
October, 2016
  • October 03, 2016: [Order on Motion for Permanent Injunction]
September, 2016
  • September 28, 2016: [Permanent Injunction]
  • September 23, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • September 23, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • September 21, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • September 21, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 21, 2016: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • September 21, 2016: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • September 21, 2016: [Request for Reassignment to a District Judge]
  • September 21, 2016: [Consent Filed]
  • September 20, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
  • September 16, 2016: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 16, 2016: [Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • September 16, 2016: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • September 16, 2016: [Order]
  • September 15, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • September 15, 2016: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • September 15, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • September 15, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.