U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00412
  • Case Name: Durette v. Warden
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2018
  • May 25, 2018: [Docket Annotation]
  • May 22, 2018: [Certificate of Service]
  • May 22, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
February, 2018
  • February 12, 2018: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • February 12, 2018: [Order]
  • February 01, 2018: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
  • February 01, 2018: [Amend/Correct]
  • February 01, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
January, 2018
  • January 09, 2018: [Order]
  • January 09, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • January 09, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 09, 2018: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
December, 2017
  • December 20, 2017: [Request]
September, 2017
  • September 14, 2017: [Request]
August, 2017
  • August 24, 2017: [Notice of Change of Address]
July, 2017
  • July 25, 2017: [Affidavit]
June, 2017
  • June 08, 2017: [Notice of Change of Address]
April, 2017
  • April 24, 2017: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
  • April 24, 2017: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • April 04, 2017: [Notice of Change of Address]
March, 2017
  • March 21, 2017: [Return Mail]
  • March 09, 2017: [Notice of Change of Address]
December, 2016
  • December 16, 2016: [Supplement]
  • December 16, 2016: [Notice of Change of Address]
October, 2016
  • October 06, 2016: [Request]
  • October 06, 2016: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
  • October 06, 2016: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
September, 2016
  • September 15, 2016: [Receipt]
  • September 15, 2016: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • September 15, 2016: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.