U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00415
  • Case Name: Clyne v. Hofkins et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2017
  • April 18, 2017: [Judgment]
  • April 18, 2017: [Order Dismissing Case]
December, 2016
  • December 29, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 29, 2016: [Supplement]
  • December 28, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 28, 2016: [Supplement]
  • December 21, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 21, 2016: [Amended Complaint]
  • December 09, 2016: [Order]
  • December 09, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
October, 2016
  • October 04, 2016: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
September, 2016
  • September 26, 2016: [Consent Filed]
  • September 15, 2016: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • September 15, 2016: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • September 15, 2016: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
  • September 15, 2016: [Complaint]
  • September 15, 2016: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.