U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00416
  • Case Name: Belcher v. Peneku et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2017
  • June 05, 2017: [Order on Motion to Reopen Case]
  • June 05, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
May, 2017
  • May 16, 2017: [Response (generic)]
  • May 16, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 02, 2017: [Order]
  • May 02, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
April, 2017
  • April 18, 2017: [Receipt]
  • April 05, 2017: [Reopen Case]
March, 2017
  • March 15, 2017: [Return Mail]
  • March 06, 2017: [Judgment]
  • March 06, 2017: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • March 02, 2017: [Letter]
November, 2016
  • November 29, 2016: [Return Mail]
  • November 21, 2016: [Order]
  • November 21, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
October, 2016
  • October 04, 2016: [Order Directing Prisoner Payment]
  • October 04, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
September, 2016
  • September 15, 2016: [Request for Reassignment Filed AND Reassignment of Case]
  • September 15, 2016: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • September 15, 2016: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • September 15, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 15, 2016: [Request]
  • September 15, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 15, 2016: [Complaint]
  • September 15, 2016: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
  • September 15, 2016: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.