U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00421
  • Case Name: Hanson v. Blaine County et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2021
  • May 19, 2021: [Attorney Fees]
April, 2021
  • April 27, 2021: [Exclude]
  • April 21, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
March, 2021
  • March 19, 2021: [In Limine]
November, 2019
  • November 05, 2019: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
October, 2019
  • October 03, 2019: [USCA Scheduling Order]
  • October 03, 2019: [USCA Case Number]
  • October 01, 2019: [Notice of Appeal]
September, 2019
  • September 26, 2019: [Witness List]
  • September 26, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 20, 2019: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • September 20, 2019: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • September 19, 2019: [Order]
  • September 19, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 19, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 16, 2019: [Joinder]
  • September 16, 2019: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • September 11, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
August, 2019
  • August 21, 2019: [In Limine]
  • August 16, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 05, 2019: [Reply to Response to Motion]
July, 2019
  • July 24, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • July 03, 2019: [Reconsideration]
June, 2019
  • June 26, 2019: [Judgment]
  • June 26, 2019: [Order on Motion for Judgment under Rule 54(b)]
May, 2019
  • May 22, 2019: [Order]
  • May 22, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 14, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
  • May 01, 2019: [Declaration]
April, 2019
  • April 23, 2019: [Errata]
  • April 18, 2019: [Judgment under Rule 54(b)]
  • April 11, 2019: [Declaration]
  • April 09, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 04, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 02, 2019: [Errata]
  • April 01, 2019: [Sealed Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 01, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
March, 2019
  • March 29, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 28, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • March 22, 2019: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • March 20, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 20, 2019: [Pretrial Order]
  • March 20, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 19, 2019: [Sealed Document]
  • March 19, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 19, 2019: [Pretrial Conference - Final]
  • March 08, 2019: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • March 08, 2019: [Trial Brief]
  • March 05, 2019: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • March 04, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • March 04, 2019: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • March 04, 2019: [Witness List]
  • March 04, 2019: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • March 04, 2019: [Trial Brief]
  • March 01, 2019: [In Limine]
January, 2019
  • January 30, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • January 21, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • January 09, 2019: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
December, 2018
  • December 31, 2018: [Order]
November, 2018
  • November 30, 2018: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • November 19, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
  • November 19, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 16, 2018: [Order]
  • November 16, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 03, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
October, 2018
  • October 30, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • October 29, 2018: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 29, 2018: [Continue]
  • October 22, 2018: [Notice of Removal of Attorney From Electronic Notice]
August, 2018
  • August 17, 2018: [In Limine]
  • August 01, 2018: [Order]
  • August 01, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
July, 2018
  • July 19, 2018: [Order]
  • July 10, 2018: [Order]
  • July 10, 2018: [Memorandum Decision]
  • July 10, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
June, 2018
  • June 26, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
  • June 06, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
May, 2018
  • May 31, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • May 31, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • May 18, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 18, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • May 18, 2018: [Strike]
  • May 17, 2018: [Affidavit in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 17, 2018: [Extension of Time to File]
  • May 17, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
April, 2018
  • April 27, 2018: [Summary Judgment]
  • April 26, 2018: [Summary Judgment]
March, 2018
  • March 01, 2018: [Order]
  • March 01, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
February, 2018
  • February 28, 2018: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • February 02, 2018: [Stipulation]
January, 2018
  • January 05, 2018: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
December, 2017
  • December 22, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • December 22, 2017: [Declaration]
  • December 22, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • December 21, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • December 19, 2017: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • December 19, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • December 18, 2017: [Declaration]
  • December 18, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
November, 2017
  • November 30, 2017: [Strike]
  • November 22, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2017
  • October 27, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
September, 2017
  • September 28, 2017: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • September 28, 2017: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • September 19, 2017: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • September 14, 2017: [Amended Complaint]
August, 2017
  • August 28, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • August 28, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • August 08, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
May, 2017
  • May 01, 2017: [Notice of Change of Address]
April, 2017
  • April 11, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
March, 2017
  • March 28, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • March 28, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 27, 2017: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 23, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 22, 2017: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • March 21, 2017: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • March 21, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • March 13, 2017: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • March 13, 2017: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • March 07, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
  • March 01, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
February, 2017
  • February 28, 2017: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • February 27, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • February 16, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • February 16, 2017: [Declaration]
  • February 10, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • February 08, 2017: [Amend/Correct]
  • February 07, 2017: [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 01, 2017: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
January, 2017
  • January 30, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
  • January 30, 2017: [Memorandum Decision]
  • January 30, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 30, 2017: [Order]
  • January 27, 2017: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • January 23, 2017: [Dismiss]
  • January 05, 2017: [Order]
  • January 05, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 05, 2017: [Consent Filed]
  • January 03, 2017: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
December, 2016
  • December 30, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
  • December 19, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • December 15, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 15, 2016: [Affidavit of Service]
  • December 15, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
September, 2016
  • September 20, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • September 16, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.