U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00420
  • Case Name: Payne v. Norco, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2017
  • May 25, 2017: [Judgment]
  • May 25, 2017: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • May 02, 2017: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
April, 2017
  • April 25, 2017: [Affidavit]
  • April 25, 2017: [Notice of Removal of Attorney From Electronic Notice]
  • April 24, 2017: [Order]
  • April 21, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 21, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 20, 2017: [Withdraw as Attorney]
March, 2017
  • March 17, 2017: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
February, 2017
  • February 24, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
  • February 24, 2017: [Order]
  • February 24, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 22, 2017: [Discovery Plan]
  • February 22, 2017: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • February 17, 2017: [Answer to Counterclaim]
  • February 16, 2017: [Notice of Substitution]
January, 2017
  • January 23, 2017: [Amended Answer to Complaint]
  • January 23, 2017: [Counterclaim]
  • January 23, 2017: [Consent Filed]
  • January 17, 2017: [Order]
  • January 17, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 12, 2017: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • January 11, 2017: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • January 11, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
  • January 11, 2017: [Counterclaim]
  • January 11, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
December, 2016
  • December 20, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
September, 2016
  • September 19, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • September 16, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.