U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00418
  • Case Name: Hooley v. Blades
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2019
  • June 17, 2019: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • June 17, 2019: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
December, 2018
  • December 10, 2018: [Stay]
October, 2018
  • October 04, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • October 02, 2018: [Consents (All are in)]
September, 2018
  • September 26, 2018: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • September 21, 2018: [Remand]
  • September 21, 2018: [Stay]
  • September 20, 2018: [Notice of Appearance]
  • September 14, 2018: [Amend/Correct]
  • September 10, 2018: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
June, 2018
  • June 20, 2018: [Supplement]
  • June 20, 2018: [Amend/Correct]
May, 2018
  • May 18, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 18, 2018: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • May 18, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Amend]
  • May 18, 2018: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
April, 2018
  • April 30, 2018: [Letter]
  • April 26, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 13, 2018: [Letter]
March, 2018
  • March 22, 2018: [Appoint Counsel]
  • March 07, 2018: [Letter]
February, 2018
  • February 28, 2018: [Amend/Correct]
  • February 12, 2018: [Letter]
January, 2018
  • January 10, 2018: [Extension of Time to Amend]
December, 2017
  • December 22, 2017: [Order]
  • December 22, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 22, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • December 21, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 13, 2017: [Notice of Change of Address]
October, 2017
  • October 17, 2017: [Letter]
  • October 04, 2017: [Compel]
September, 2017
  • September 08, 2017: [Amend/Correct]
  • September 08, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
August, 2017
  • August 15, 2017: [Letter]
June, 2017
  • June 15, 2017: [Letter]
  • June 02, 2017: [Letter]
May, 2017
  • May 10, 2017: [Notice of Change of Address]
April, 2017
  • April 28, 2017: [Take Judicial Notice]
  • April 28, 2017: [Amend/Correct]
March, 2017
  • March 24, 2017: [Order]
  • March 24, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 24, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • March 10, 2017: [Letter]
  • March 07, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 07, 2017: [Amend/Correct]
February, 2017
  • February 14, 2017: [Receipt]
January, 2017
  • January 23, 2017: [Letter]
  • January 06, 2017: [Letter]
November, 2016
  • November 28, 2016: [Notice of Change of Address]
September, 2016
  • September 23, 2016: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • September 23, 2016: [Consent Filed]
  • September 19, 2016: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • September 19, 2016: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • September 19, 2016: [Take Judicial Notice]
  • September 19, 2016: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
  • September 19, 2016: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
  • September 19, 2016: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.