U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00419
  • Case Name: DeVan v. Corizon Health Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2018
  • June 06, 2018: [Judgment]
  • June 06, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
April, 2018
  • April 25, 2018: [Return Mail]
  • April 12, 2018: [Order]
  • April 12, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
February, 2018
  • February 28, 2018: [Return Mail]
  • February 09, 2018: [Order Reassigning Case]
October, 2017
  • October 04, 2017: [Notice of Change of Address]
September, 2017
  • September 06, 2017: [Response (generic)]
July, 2017
  • July 31, 2017: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
May, 2017
  • May 12, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
  • May 01, 2017: [Order Directing Prisoner Payment]
  • May 01, 2017: [Order]
  • May 01, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
April, 2017
  • April 17, 2017: [Notice of Change of Address]
October, 2016
  • October 13, 2016: [Request]
September, 2016
  • September 20, 2016: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • September 20, 2016: [Request for Reassignment Filed AND Reassignment of Case]
  • September 20, 2016: [Complaint]
  • September 20, 2016: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
  • September 20, 2016: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.