U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00423
  • Case Name: Stradley v. Colvin
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2017
  • March 27, 2017: [Reply (generic)]
  • March 06, 2017: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
February, 2017
  • February 02, 2017: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
January, 2017
  • January 12, 2017: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • January 09, 2017: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • January 09, 2017: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • January 03, 2017: [Administrative Record]
  • January 03, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
November, 2016
  • November 02, 2016: [Consent Filed]
  • November 01, 2016: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • November 01, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
October, 2016
  • October 14, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
September, 2016
  • September 30, 2016: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 22, 2016: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • September 22, 2016: [Procedural Order (SS)]
  • September 22, 2016: [Corrective Entry]
  • September 22, 2016: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • September 20, 2016: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • September 20, 2016: [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • September 20, 2016: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 20, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.