U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00424
  • Case Name: Jimenez Lozano v. Villagomez Villalobos
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2018
  • July 17, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • July 16, 2018: [Status Conference]
  • July 16, 2018: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • July 02, 2018: [Status Report]
April, 2018
  • April 30, 2018: [Status Conference]
  • April 30, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 23, 2018: [Status Report]
February, 2018
  • February 20, 2018: [Status Conference]
  • February 20, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 16, 2018: [Status Report]
December, 2017
  • December 19, 2017: [Status Conference]
  • December 12, 2017: [Status Report]
October, 2017
  • October 02, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 02, 2017: [Order]
September, 2017
  • September 27, 2017: [Status Report]
July, 2017
  • July 12, 2017: [Status Report]
May, 2017
  • May 22, 2017: [Status Report]
April, 2017
  • April 03, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 03, 2017: [Supplement]
February, 2017
  • February 01, 2017: [~Util - Case Stayed]
  • February 01, 2017: [Status Conference]
  • February 01, 2017: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • February 01, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 01, 2017: [Notice of Hearing]
January, 2017
  • January 23, 2017: [Status Conference]
  • January 23, 2017: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • January 17, 2017: [Declaration]
  • January 17, 2017: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
  • January 09, 2017: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 03, 2017: [Scheduling Conference]
December, 2016
  • December 23, 2016: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • December 16, 2016: [Order]
  • December 16, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 16, 2016: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • December 08, 2016: [Order]
  • December 01, 2016: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
November, 2016
  • November 08, 2016: [Order]
  • November 08, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
October, 2016
  • October 20, 2016: [Consent Filed]
  • October 19, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 18, 2016: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • October 18, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
  • October 06, 2016: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • October 06, 2016: [Order]
September, 2016
  • September 27, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • September 27, 2016: [Receipt]
  • September 23, 2016: [Corrective Entry]
  • September 22, 2016: [Complaint]
  • September 20, 2016: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 20, 2016: [Supplement]
  • September 20, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.