U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00426
  • Case Name: Hawkins v. Corizon et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2017
  • August 04, 2017: [USCA Order]
June, 2017
  • June 29, 2017: [USCA Order]
  • June 29, 2017: [USCA Scheduling Order]
  • June 29, 2017: [USCA Case Number]
  • June 29, 2017: [Notice of Appeal]
  • June 15, 2017: [Certificate of Appealability]
  • June 13, 2017: [Judgment]
  • June 13, 2017: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • June 13, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
April, 2017
  • April 18, 2017: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • April 18, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
December, 2016
  • December 30, 2016: [Amended Complaint]
November, 2016
  • November 30, 2016: [Order]
  • November 30, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
September, 2016
  • September 20, 2016: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • September 20, 2016: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • September 20, 2016: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • September 20, 2016: [Complaint]
  • September 20, 2016: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.