U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00422
  • Case Name: Hogan v. Idaho State Board of Correction et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2018
  • September 26, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • September 25, 2018: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • September 17, 2018: [Status Report Order]
  • September 13, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
August, 2018
  • August 20, 2018: [Order]
  • August 20, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 20, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 16, 2018: [Response to Motion]
July, 2018
  • July 27, 2018: [Trial]
June, 2018
  • June 12, 2018: [Notice of Substitution]
May, 2018
  • May 15, 2018: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • May 15, 2018: [Order on Motion to Strike]
January, 2018
  • January 31, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • January 17, 2018: [Strike]
  • January 17, 2018: [Reply (generic)]
  • January 11, 2018: [Strike]
  • January 11, 2018: [Reply (generic)]
December, 2017
  • December 22, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • December 18, 2017: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • December 05, 2017: [Response to Motion]
November, 2017
  • November 30, 2017: [Notice of Summary Judgment]
  • November 15, 2017: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • November 13, 2017: [Summary Judgment]
  • November 08, 2017: [Affidavit in Opposition to Motion]
October, 2017
  • October 31, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • October 18, 2017: [Compel]
September, 2017
  • September 08, 2017: [Order]
  • September 08, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • September 07, 2017: [Stipulation]
March, 2017
  • March 16, 2017: [Consents (All are in)]
  • March 02, 2017: [Notice of Change of Address]
February, 2017
  • February 22, 2017: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • February 22, 2017: [Corrective Entry]
  • February 13, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 10, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
  • February 10, 2017: [Notice of Substitution]
January, 2017
  • January 09, 2017: [Waiver of Service Executed]
December, 2016
  • December 09, 2016: [Certificate of Clerk]
  • December 09, 2016: [Order]
  • December 09, 2016: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
October, 2016
  • October 04, 2016: [Certificate of Service]
  • October 04, 2016: [Order Directing Prisoner Payment]
  • October 04, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
September, 2016
  • September 27, 2016: [Consent Filed]
  • September 20, 2016: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • September 20, 2016: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • September 20, 2016: [Complaint]
  • September 20, 2016: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 20, 2016: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.