U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:16-cv-00427
  • Case Name: Nelson-Ricks Cheese Company, Inc. v. Lakeview Cheese Company LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2021
  • August 25, 2021: [Attorney Fees]
April, 2020
  • April 15, 2020: [Attorney Fees]
March, 2020
  • March 25, 2020: [Memorandum Decision]
  • March 24, 2020: [Memorandum Decision]
  • March 24, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 23, 2020: [Memorandum Decision]
  • March 23, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 23, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
December, 2019
  • December 27, 2019: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 27, 2019: [Corrective Entry - Proposed Orders]
  • December 19, 2019: [Certificate of Compliance]
  • December 18, 2019: [Order]
  • December 18, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 16, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
October, 2019
  • October 23, 2019: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • October 09, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • October 09, 2019: [USCA Mandate]
  • October 02, 2019: [USCA Order]
September, 2019
  • September 26, 2019: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • September 18, 2019: [Compel]
  • September 18, 2019: [Writ Issued]
  • September 13, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • September 03, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2019
  • August 23, 2019: [Quash]
  • August 21, 2019: [USCA Memorandum]
  • August 16, 2019: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • August 02, 2019: [Response to Motion]
July, 2019
  • July 18, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 17, 2019: [Errata]
  • July 12, 2019: [Certificate of Service]
  • July 12, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
June, 2019
  • June 28, 2019: [Judgment - Attorney Fees]
December, 2018
  • December 27, 2018: [Notice of Appeal]
November, 2018
  • November 27, 2018: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
  • November 27, 2018: [Order on Motion to Supplement]
  • November 08, 2018: [Supplement]
  • November 06, 2018: [Order]
  • November 06, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
August, 2018
  • August 31, 2018: [Transcript Request]
  • August 30, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • August 27, 2018: [Appeal Transcript Request]
  • August 21, 2018: [Appeal Transcript]
  • August 21, 2018: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • August 16, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
July, 2018
  • July 31, 2018: [USCA Scheduling Order]
  • July 31, 2018: [USCA Case Number]
  • July 27, 2018: [Notice of Appeal]
  • July 26, 2018: [Bill of Costs]
  • July 26, 2018: [Attorney Fees]
  • July 13, 2018: [Judgment]
  • July 13, 2018: [Memorandum Decision]
  • July 13, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
June, 2018
  • June 27, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • June 27, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • June 22, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • June 13, 2018: [Supplement]
May, 2018
  • May 24, 2018: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • May 24, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
  • May 16, 2018: [Order]
  • May 16, 2018: [Memorandum Decision]
  • May 16, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
April, 2018
  • April 18, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 13, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 11, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 06, 2018: [Sanctions]
March, 2018
  • March 28, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 23, 2018: [Order]
  • March 23, 2018: [Memorandum Decision]
  • March 23, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 23, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 07, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • March 07, 2018: [Exclude]
  • March 05, 2018: [Certificate of Service]
  • March 05, 2018: [Notice of Substitution]
February, 2018
  • February 22, 2018: [Statement]
  • February 21, 2018: [Sealed Document]
  • February 21, 2018: [Seal Document]
  • February 21, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • February 01, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • February 01, 2018: [Affidavit]
January, 2018
  • January 31, 2018: [Summary Judgment]
  • January 24, 2018: [Strike]
  • January 17, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • January 03, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
December, 2017
  • December 13, 2017: [Leave to File Document]
November, 2017
  • November 16, 2017: [Order]
  • November 14, 2017: [Notice of Removal of Attorney From Electronic Notice]
  • November 13, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • November 09, 2017: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • November 06, 2017: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • November 06, 2017: [Notice of Substitution]
October, 2017
  • October 27, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 26, 2017: [Protective Order]
  • October 26, 2017: [Memorandum Decision]
  • October 26, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 26, 2017: [Order]
  • October 26, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • October 25, 2017: [Supplement]
  • October 25, 2017: [Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
  • October 25, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • October 24, 2017: [Sealed Document]
  • October 24, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • October 24, 2017: [Seal Document]
  • October 23, 2017: [Strike]
  • October 20, 2017: [Quash]
  • October 02, 2017: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • October 02, 2017: [Counterclaim]
  • October 02, 2017: [Settlement Conference]
September, 2017
  • September 18, 2017: [Amended Complaint]
  • September 14, 2017: [Memorandum Decision]
  • September 14, 2017: [Order]
  • September 14, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 14, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
August, 2017
  • August 28, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • August 22, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
June, 2017
  • June 06, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
May, 2017
  • May 30, 2017: [Order]
  • May 30, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 24, 2017: [Status Conference]
  • May 24, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 23, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • May 02, 2017: [Amend/Correct]
  • May 01, 2017: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
April, 2017
  • April 18, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 14, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 11, 2017: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 07, 2017: [Leave to File Document]
January, 2017
  • January 31, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 31, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 31, 2017: [Protective Order]
  • January 30, 2017: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • January 30, 2017: [Scheduling Conference]
  • January 25, 2017: [Scheduling Conf Form/Litigation Plan]
  • January 25, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • January 25, 2017: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • January 25, 2017: [Discovery Plan]
  • January 23, 2017: [Corrective Entry - Discovery]
  • January 23, 2017: [Disclosure Statement]
  • January 20, 2017: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 17, 2017: [Order]
  • January 17, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
December, 2016
  • December 30, 2016: [Consents (All are in)]
  • December 29, 2016: [Consent Filed]
  • December 27, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
  • December 16, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
  • December 05, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
November, 2016
  • November 10, 2016: [Order]
  • November 10, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • November 07, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • November 07, 2016: [Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • November 07, 2016: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • November 04, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • November 04, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
October, 2016
  • October 26, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • October 07, 2016: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • October 06, 2016: [Order]
September, 2016
  • September 21, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • September 20, 2016: [Report Regarding Patent & Trademark]
  • September 20, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • September 20, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.