U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00428
  • Case Name: WildEarth Guardians v. Lannom et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2017
  • February 01, 2017: [Memorandum Decision]
  • February 01, 2017: [Order Dismissing Case]
January, 2017
  • January 13, 2017: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 09, 2017: [Stay]
  • January 04, 2017: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
November, 2016
  • November 22, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 22, 2016: [Order]
  • November 22, 2016: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • November 22, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 21, 2016: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • November 21, 2016: [Certificate of Service]
  • November 07, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
October, 2016
  • October 27, 2016: [Corrective Entry - Certificate of Service]
  • October 27, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 27, 2016: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • October 24, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
September, 2016
  • September 22, 2016: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • September 22, 2016: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • September 21, 2016: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • September 21, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • September 21, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.