U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00425
  • Case Name: Mendez v. Community Health Clinics, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2020
  • June 03, 2020: [Strike]
May, 2020
  • May 29, 2020: [Response to Motion]
  • May 29, 2020: [Amended Complaint]
  • May 29, 2020: [Leave to File Document]
  • May 29, 2020: [Sanctions]
  • May 29, 2020: [Compel]
April, 2020
  • April 10, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 09, 2020: [Response to Motion]
  • April 07, 2020: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 06, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
March, 2020
  • March 27, 2020: [Amended Document (NOT Motion)]
  • March 26, 2020: [Notice of Summary Judgment]
  • March 25, 2020: [Dismiss]
January, 2020
  • January 22, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 22, 2020: [Memorandum Decision]
  • January 22, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
September, 2019
  • September 10, 2019: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • September 03, 2019: [Reply to Response to Motion]
August, 2019
  • August 29, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • August 21, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • August 13, 2019: [Notice of Summary Judgment]
  • August 12, 2019: [Dismiss]
July, 2019
  • July 15, 2019: [Response to Motion]
June, 2019
  • June 25, 2019: [Reconsideration]
May, 2019
  • May 30, 2019: [Memorandum Decision]
  • May 30, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 09, 2019: [Compel]
March, 2019
  • March 25, 2019: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • March 14, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • March 04, 2019: [Leave to File Document]
October, 2018
  • October 11, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 03, 2018: [Stipulation]
July, 2018
  • July 16, 2018: [Order]
  • July 16, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
June, 2018
  • June 18, 2018: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • June 01, 2018: [Order]
  • June 01, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
May, 2018
  • May 15, 2018: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 15, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 14, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2017
  • October 31, 2017: [Discovery Plan]
  • October 31, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 30, 2017: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • October 17, 2017: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • October 17, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2017
  • September 28, 2017: [Reconsideration]
  • September 28, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2017
  • August 28, 2017: [Litigation Order]
  • August 25, 2017: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • August 24, 2017: [Corrective Entry]
  • August 17, 2017: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • August 17, 2017: [Order]
July, 2017
  • July 19, 2017: [Consents (All are in)]
  • July 07, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
June, 2017
  • June 26, 2017: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • June 20, 2017: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • June 20, 2017: [Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • June 20, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
  • June 13, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • June 05, 2017: [Order]
April, 2017
  • April 13, 2017: [Appoint Counsel]
  • April 12, 2017: [Appoint Counsel]
March, 2017
  • March 28, 2017: [Summons Issued]
  • March 28, 2017: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
September, 2016
  • September 29, 2016: [Consent Filed]
  • September 22, 2016: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • September 22, 2016: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • September 22, 2016: [Complaint]
  • September 22, 2016: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.