U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00431
  • Case Name: Hulbert et al v. American Institute of Health Technology et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2018
  • October 23, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • October 23, 2018: [Dismiss]
June, 2018
  • June 04, 2018: [Order]
  • June 04, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 04, 2018: [Stipulation]
September, 2017
  • September 15, 2017: [Notice of Change of Address]
May, 2017
  • May 17, 2017: [Order]
  • May 17, 2017: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • May 15, 2017: [Status Conference]
  • May 15, 2017: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • May 09, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 09, 2017: [Order]
  • May 09, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 08, 2017: [Stipulation]
December, 2016
  • December 23, 2016: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • December 20, 2016: [Order Staying Case]
  • December 20, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 16, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • December 05, 2016: [Stipulation]
November, 2016
  • November 08, 2016: [Order]
  • November 08, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 04, 2016: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • November 04, 2016: [Order]
October, 2016
  • October 24, 2016: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • October 19, 2016: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • October 19, 2016: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • October 19, 2016: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
September, 2016
  • September 23, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • September 22, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.