U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00430
  • Case Name: Rodriguez v. North Idaho College et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2016
  • December 06, 2016: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • December 05, 2016: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
November, 2016
  • November 15, 2016: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • November 15, 2016: [Amended Complaint]
October, 2016
  • October 19, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
September, 2016
  • September 23, 2016: [Docket Annotation]
  • September 22, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.