U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00429
  • Case Name: John and Jane Does 1-104 v. Wasden et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 15, 2021: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
July, 2021
  • July 19, 2021: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
May, 2021
  • May 04, 2021: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
March, 2021
  • March 31, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • March 01, 2021: [Extension of Time to Amend]
April, 2020
  • April 17, 2020: [USCA Order]
June, 2019
  • June 24, 2019: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • June 24, 2019: [Appeal Transcript]
  • June 04, 2019: [Appeal Transcript Request]
May, 2019
  • May 05, 2019: [Notice of Appeal]
April, 2019
  • April 09, 2019: [Judgment]
  • April 05, 2019: [Memorandum Decision]
March, 2019
  • March 12, 2019: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • March 12, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
December, 2018
  • December 21, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • December 07, 2018: [Response to Motion]
November, 2018
  • November 06, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • November 06, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
October, 2018
  • October 18, 2018: [Dismiss]
  • October 02, 2018: [Notice of Substitution]
September, 2018
  • September 14, 2018: [Notice of Removal of Attorney From Electronic Notice]
  • September 13, 2018: [Extension of Time to File]
August, 2018
  • August 30, 2018: [Amended Complaint]
  • August 08, 2018: [Notice of Appearance]
July, 2018
  • July 09, 2018: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 09, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Amend]
  • July 06, 2018: [Extension of Time to Amend]
May, 2018
  • May 17, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
April, 2018
  • April 18, 2018: [Amended Document (NOT Motion)]
  • April 18, 2018: [Notice of Substitution]
  • April 04, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
March, 2018
  • March 07, 2018: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • March 07, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
February, 2018
  • February 12, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • February 09, 2018: [Notice of Appearance]
  • February 02, 2018: [Response to Motion]
January, 2018
  • January 29, 2018: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • January 23, 2018: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 23, 2018: [Order]
  • January 23, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 22, 2018: [File Excess Pages]
  • January 22, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • January 08, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • January 05, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
December, 2017
  • December 07, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • December 06, 2017: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
November, 2017
  • November 17, 2017: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • November 17, 2017: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
  • November 16, 2017: [File Excess Pages]
October, 2017
  • October 27, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • October 27, 2017: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
September, 2017
  • September 25, 2017: [Waiver of Service Executed]
August, 2017
  • August 07, 2017: [Affidavit of Service]
  • August 07, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • August 02, 2017: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • August 02, 2017: [Notice of Case Number Change]
July, 2017
  • July 12, 2017: [Order]
June, 2017
  • June 03, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
April, 2017
  • April 27, 2017: [Summons Issued]
  • April 26, 2017: [Amended Complaint]
February, 2017
  • February 17, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
December, 2016
  • December 21, 2016: [Status Report]
September, 2016
  • September 22, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.